EP4084862 - DEVICE FOR, AND METHOD OF, NEUROMODULATION WITH CLOSED- LOOP MICROMAGNETIC HYBRID WAVEFORMS TO RELIEVE PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantum Nanostim LLC 213 126th Ave. Treasure Island, FL 33706 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REILLY, Thomas 213 126th Ave. Treasure Island, FL 33706 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Bewley, Ewan Stuart InCompass IP Europe Limited 51 Paddock Mead Harlow, Essex CM18 7RR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | inCompass IP Europe Limited 51 Paddock Mead Harlow, Essex CM18 7RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 21754513.6 | 12.02.2021 | [2022/45] | WO2021US17783 | Priority number, date | US202062975811P | 13.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062975811 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021163428 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084862 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/372, A61N1/05, A61N1/32, A61N1/378 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
A61N1/0551 (EP,IL);
A61N2/008 (US);
A61N1/36071 (EP,IL);
A61N1/40 (EP,IL);
A61N2/002 (US);
A61N2/006 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR NEUROMODULATION MIT MIKROMAGNETISCHEN HYBRIDWELLENFORMEN MIT GESCHLOSSENER SCHLEIFE ZUR SCHMERZLINDERUNG | [2022/45] | English: | DEVICE FOR, AND METHOD OF, NEUROMODULATION WITH CLOSED- LOOP MICROMAGNETIC HYBRID WAVEFORMS TO RELIEVE PAIN | [2022/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE NEUROMODULATION À FORMES D'ONDE HYBRIDES MICROMAGNÉTIQUES EN BOUCLE FERMÉE POUR SOULAGER LA DOULEUR | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 07.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011190858 (GERBER MARTIN T [US], et al); | [A]US2012130461 (OLSEN JAMES M [US], et al); | [A]EP2111253 (SPINAL MODULATION INC [US]) | International search | [A]US7813803 (HERUTH KENNETH T [US], et al) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [A]US2012310140 (KRAMER JEFFERY [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2013172774 (CROWDER TARA L [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US10039930 (VALLEJO RICARDO [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US10493276 (MOFFITT MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document * | by applicant | US2011190858 |