EP4106503 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LS Electric Co., Ltd. (Hogye-dong) 127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 14119 / KR | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Su Hyeong Global R D Campus 40, LS-ro 116beon-gil, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14118 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Soo Yong Global R D Campus 40, LS-ro 116beon-gil, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14118 / KR | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Karolinen Karree Karlstraße 12 80333 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21754533.4 | 12.01.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021KR00387 | Priority number, date | KR20200017536 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200017536 | [2022/51] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021162247 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106503 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/00, H05K5/06 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H05K7/14327 (EP,KR);
H05K5/0052 (KR,US);
H01H13/04 (US);
H05K5/0018 (KR,US);
H05K5/06 (KR);
H01H13/023 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROL APPARATUS | [2022/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | Translation filed | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 30.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6463263 (FEILNER WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, lines 29-40 * * column 8, lines 35-45 * * column 6, lines 44-51 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 3 * * figures 1,2,4 * [I] 2,3,5-10; | [A]US2015183456 (NISHIMURA TOSHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US2019166705 (KATO YOSHIKI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0004] * | International search | [Y]JP2000067692 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 2,5 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0059] and figure 1. *; | [Y]JP2002536916 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0025]-[0069] and figures 1-4 and 8. *; | [A]KR20080056966 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0042]-[0072] and figures 2-4. *; | [Y]KR20100037852 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0067] and figures 2-4. *; | [Y]JP2014086358 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 4 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0024] and figures 1-4. * |