EP4381263 - APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING A ROTOR DURING A BALANCING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSAL BALANCING LIMITED Unit 15 Warmley Business Park Crown Road, Warmley Bristol BS30 8FR / GB | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOWLER, Steve Bristol BS30 8FR / GB | 02 /
AINSLIE, Eric Bristol BS30 8FR / GB | 03 /
PAYNE, Benjamin Bristol BS30 8FR / GB | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 21755028.4 | 02.08.2021 | [2024/24] | WO2021GB51997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023012441 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4381263 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/04, G01M1/16, G01M1/34, H02K15/16 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
G01M1/04 (EP);
G01M1/16 (EP);
G01M1/34 (EP);
H02K15/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ROTORABSTÜTZUNG WÄHREND EINES AUSWUCHTPROZESSES | [2024/24] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING A ROTOR DURING A BALANCING PROCESS | [2024/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE SUPPORT D'UN ROTOR PENDANT UN PROCESSUS D'ÉQUILIBRAGE | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2751262 (KLAUS FEDERN, et al); | [XI]EP3444463 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND ENGINE & TURBOCHARGER LTD [JP]); | [XI]CN105932839B |