EP4193020 - VEHICLE RESTRAINT SYSTEM WITH VERTICAL POST FOR A ROCKFALL PROTECTION FENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/24] | VERTICAL POST FOR A ROCKFALL PROTECTION FENCE | ||
[2024/15] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Correction of patent specification | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirchdorfer Fertigteilholding GmbH Kirchdorfer Platz 1 2752 Wöllersdorf / AT | For all designated states Trumer Schutzbauten GmbH Maria-Bühel-Straße 7 5110 Oberndorf bei Salzburg / AT | [2024/38] |
Former [2023/24] | For all designated states Kirchdorfer Fertigteilholding GmbH Kirchdorfer Platz 1 2752 Wöllersdorf / AT | ||
For all designated states Trumer Schutzbauten GmbH Weissenbach 5431 Kuchl / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINER, Johann 5431 Kuchl / AT | 02 /
BARNAS, Alexander 1020 Wien / AT | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte KG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21755423.7 | 02.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP71588 | Priority number, date | AT20200050653 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: AT 506532020 | [2023/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022029089 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193020 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4193020 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/33] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP4193020 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E01F7/04, E01F15/08 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
E01F7/045 (EP);
E01F7/00 (AT);
E01F15/083 (EP);
E01F15/088 (EP);
E01F8/00 (AT)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGRÜCKHALTESYSTEM MIT STEHER FÜR EINEN STEINSCHLAGSCHUTZZAUN | [2024/15] | English: | VEHICLE RESTRAINT SYSTEM WITH VERTICAL POST FOR A ROCKFALL PROTECTION FENCE | [2024/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RETENUE DE VÉHICULES AVEC UN MONTANT VERTICAL POUR CLÔTURE DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES CHUTES DE PIERRES | [2024/15] |
Former [2023/24] | STEHER FÜR EINEN STEINSCHLAGSCHUTZZAUN | ||
Former [2023/24] | VERTICAL POST FOR A ROCKFALL PROTECTION FENCE | ||
Former [2023/24] | MONTANT VERTICAL POUR CLÔTURE DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES CHUTES DE PIERRES | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2022 | Observations by third parties | 04.02.2023 | Observations by third parties | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5186438 (CROSS RICHARD H [US], et al); | [XI]AT402212B (FEBAUROEHRS GES M B H KG [AT]); | [XI]US2015110549 (ESPOSITO JOSEPH [US], et al); | [X]US10221529 (SANDERS KEITH A [US], et al) |