EP4192760 - A PACKAGING FOR TOBACCO PRODUCTS OR TOBACCO SUBSTITUTE PRODUCTS COMPRISING A PARTICULATE TOBACCO ODORANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERLAAN, Theodorus 1206 Geneva / CH | 02 /
SORIANO, Miguel 1206 Geneva / CH | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/24] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21755507.7 | 06.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP72051 | Priority number, date | EP20200190115 | 07.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20190115 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022029310 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192760 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
B65D85/1045 (EP);
B65D2203/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG FÜR TABAKPRODUKTE ODER TABAKERSATZPRODUKTE MIT EINEM PARTIKELFÖRMIGEN TABAKGERUCHSSTOFF | [2023/24] | English: | A PACKAGING FOR TOBACCO PRODUCTS OR TOBACCO SUBSTITUTE PRODUCTS COMPRISING A PARTICULATE TOBACCO ODORANT | [2023/24] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR PRODUITS DE TABAC OU PRODUITS DE SUBSTITUTION DU TABAC COMPRENANT UN ODORISANT DE TABAC PARTICULAIRE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 06.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6237760 (PARKER MICHAEL PATRICK [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* column 1, line 44 - column 9, line 21; figures 1-29 *; | [Y]US2002195355 (DENNEN ROBERT P [US]) [Y] 2,3,14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] *; | [A]RU2202504 (BRITISH AMERIKEHN TOBEHKKO INV [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0067]; figures 1-31 *; | [XYI]WO2017093941 (NICONOVUM USA INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7,9-13,15 * page 27, lines 1-12 * * page 20, lines 5-20; figure 6 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 12 * [Y] 2,3,14 [I] 8 | by applicant | US5938018 | US6612429 | US10653175 |