EP4185340 - NANOPARTICLES, NANOFUNCTIONALISED SUBSTRATE AND DEVICE WITH ANTIVIRAL AND/OR ANTIBACTERIAL AND/OR ANTIFUNGAL PHOTOCATALYTIC ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colorobbia Consulting S.R.L. Via Pietramarina 53 Frazione Sovigliana 50059 Vinci (Firenze) / IT | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDI, Giovanni 50056 Montelupo Fiorentino (Firenze) / IT | 02 /
NICCOLAI, Laura 50056 Montelupo Fiorentino (Firenze) / IT | 03 /
BITOSSI, Marco 50056 Montelupo Fiorentino (Firenze) / IT | 04 /
LORENZI, Giada 51034 Serravalle Pistoiese (Pistoia) / IT | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Biggi, Cristina Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21755821.2 | 22.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021IB56631 | Priority number, date | IT20200017995 | 24.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000017995 | IT20200018004 | 24.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000018004 | IT20200018007 | 24.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000018007 | [2023/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022018678 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185340 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/00 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A61L2/088 (EP);
A61L2/0076 (EP);
A61L9/205 (EP);
A61L2202/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | NANOPARTIKEL, NANOFUNKTIONALISIERTES SUBSTRAT UND VORRICHTUNG MIT ANTIVIRALER UND/ODER ANTIBAKTERIELLER UND/ODER ANTIMYKOTISCHER PHOTOKATALYTISCHER AKTIVITÄT | [2023/22] | English: | NANOPARTICLES, NANOFUNCTIONALISED SUBSTRATE AND DEVICE WITH ANTIVIRAL AND/OR ANTIBACTERIAL AND/OR ANTIFUNGAL PHOTOCATALYTIC ACTIVITY | [2023/22] | French: | NANOPARTICULES, SUBSTRAT NANOFONCTIONNALISÉ ET DISPOSITIF À ACTIVITÉ PHOTOCATALYTIQUE ANTIVIRALE ET/OU ANTIBACTÉRIENNE ET/OU ANTIFONGIQUE | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 15.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/36] | Request for further processing for: | 19.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 19.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IDY]WO2019211787 (COLOROBBIA CONSULTING S R L [IT]) [ID] 1-6,8,9 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 19; claims 1,6, 18,19-22 * [Y] 7; | [IY]CN110946147 (LIANYUNGANG YONGRONG BIOLOGICAL TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-6,8,9 * Section "The beneficial effects of the present invention are:" * [Y] 7; | [XYI] - ASAHI RYOJI ET AL, "Nitrogen-Doped Titanium Dioxide as Visible-Light-Sensitive Photocatalyst: Designs, Developments, and Prospects", US, vol. 114, no. 19, doi:10.1021/cr5000738, ISSN 0009-2665, (20140912), pages 9824 - 9852, CHEMICAL REVIEWS, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/cr5000738, XP055793706 [X] 1-5,8,9 * section 3., in particular 3.1.1, 3.2.3, section 4. * * section 7, in particular 7.4, 7.5 * [Y] 7 [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr5000738 | [IP] - MIYAUCHI MASAHIRO ET AL, "Antiviral Effect of Visible Light-Sensitive CuxO/TiO2 Photocatalyst", CATALYSTS, (20200921), vol. 10, no. 9, doi:10.3390/catal10091093, page 1093, XP055793093 [IP] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/catal10091093 | [XYI] - AHMAD MUHAMMAD ARSLAN ET AL, "Appraisal of Comparative Therapeutic Potential of Undoped and Nitrogen-Doped Titanium Dioxide Nanoparticles", MOLECULES, (20191030), vol. 24, no. 21, doi:10.3390/molecules24213916, page 3916, XP055793710 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * section 3.2.2, 3.8 * [Y] 7 [I] 8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules24213916 | [XYI] - SETHI DIPTIPRIYA ET AL, "Water disinfection through photoactive modified titania", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B: BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE S.A., BASEL, CH, (20131214), vol. 130, doi:10.1016/J.JPHOTOBIOL.2013.12.003, ISSN 1011-1344, pages 310 - 317, XP028616376 [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 7 [I] 8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jphotobiol.2013.12.003 |