EP4200603 - METHOD FOR CHARACTERIZING A PART THROUGH NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHER, Clément 91400 ORSAY / FR | 02 /
MESNIL, Olivier 91400 ORSAY / FR | 03 /
MIORELLI, Roberto 91191 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | INNOV-GROUP 310, avenue Berthelot 69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21756011.9 | 19.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021EP73061 | Priority number, date | FR20200008564 | 19.08.2020 Original published format: FR 2008564 | [2023/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022038233 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200603 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/44, G06N3/04 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G01N29/4481 (EP,US);
G01N21/8851 (US);
G01N23/18 (US);
G01N25/72 (US);
G01N27/90 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINES TEILS DURCH ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIE PRÜFUNG | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD FOR CHARACTERIZING A PART THROUGH NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CARACTÉRISATION D'UNE PIÈCE PAR CONTRÔLE NON DESTRUCTIF | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 16.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2721111 (ICPI LYON [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 3-15 ** page 7, lines 6-15; claims 6,7 *; | [A]US2019094124 (AMER AYMAN [SA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0039]; claims 1,2 *; | [A] - ZHANG MEI ET AL, "Two-step Convolutional Neural Network for Image Defect Detection", 2019 CHINESE CONTROL CONFERENCE (CCC), TECHNICAL COMMITTEE ON CONTROL THEORY, CHINESE ASSOCIATION OF AUTOMATION, (20190727), doi:10.23919/CHICC.2019.8866625, pages 8525 - 8530, XP033635565 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 8526, paragraph 2.Dataset... * * page 8527 - page 8528, column r, line 6; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23919/ChiCC.2019.8866625 | [A] - SAEED NUMAN ET AL, "Automatic defects detection in CFRP thermograms, using convolutional neural networks and transfer learning", INFRARED PHYSICS AND TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 102, doi:10.1016/J.INFRARED.2019.103048, ISSN 1350-4495, (20190923), pages 1 - 8, (20190923), XP085883933 [A] 1-15 * page 1, column l * * page 2, paragraph 3.Transfer... * * page 2, paragraph 2.Convolutional... * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.infrared.2019.103048 |