EP4094502 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGEMENT DATA ANALYTICS SERVICE (MDAS) ASSISTED PAGING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUTAM, Deepanshu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KUMAR, Anikethan Ramakrishna Vijaya Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21756806.2 | 22.02.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021KR02196 | Priority number, date | IN202041007507 | 21.02.2020 Original published format: IN202041007507 | IN202041007507 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: IN202041007507 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021167423 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094502 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/02, H04W24/02 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W68/08 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W68/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H04W68/02, H04W24/10, H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR MANAGEMENTDATEN-ANALYSEDIENST (MDAS)-UNTERSTÜTZTES PAGING IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGEMENT DATA ANALYTICS SERVICE (MDAS) ASSISTED PAGING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UNE RADIOMESSAGERIE ASSISTÉE PAR UN SERVICE D'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES DE GESTION (MDAS) DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "Use of analytics for UE mobility procedures", vol. SA WG2, no. Kochi, India; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190124), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-1900960-REV-S2-1900651-AMF-PCF-OPTIMIZATIONS-CR23501-F40-REV1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS C, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/SA2/Docs/S2%2D1900960%2Ezip, (20190124), XP051595574 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Management and orchestration; Study on enhancement of Management Data Analytics (MDA) (Release 17)", (20201203), 3GPP DRAFT; S5-206338, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG5_TM/TSGS5_134e/Inbox/S5-206338.zip 28809-110.docx, (20201203), XP051965906 [XP] 1-15 * chapter 6.7.1 "Paging optimization" * | International search | [A]WO2019032968 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0200]-[0210]; and figure 23 *; | [A]WO2020025009 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0122]-[0150]; and figures 12-13 *; | [A]WO2020033424 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041]-[0056]; and figures 4-5 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Management and orchestration; 5G performance measurements (Release 16)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Specification; 3GPP TS 28.552, (20200102), vol. SA WG5, no. V16.4.0, pages 1 - 159, XP051841049 [A] 1-15 * section 5.2.5.2 * | [A] - Anonymous, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Background for Integrated access and backhaul radio transmission and reception (Release 16)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Report; 3GPP TR 38.809, (20200615), no. V0.2.0, pages 1 - 24, XP051894123 [A] 1-15 * section 6.1 * | by applicant | - "Use of analytics for UE mobility procedures", 3GPP document S2-1900960 | - 3GPP TS 23.501 |