EP4101024 - AN ANTI-TAMPERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states de Klerk, Vivien 301 Patula Street Lynnwood Ridge 0081 Pretoria / ZA | For all designated states Venter, Jacobus Petrus 1042 Seeleeu Street Pretorius Park 0081 Pretoria / ZA | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21757073.8 | 18.02.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021ZA50009 | Priority number, date | ZA20200001005 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: ZA 202001005 | ZA20200007424 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: ZA 202007424 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021168487 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101024 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/576, G08B13/14, // G08B13/06, G08B13/08, G08B13/189, G08B21/02 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G08B13/06 (EP,US);
H01M50/576 (EP,US);
G08B13/08 (EP,US);
G08B13/1895 (EP,US);
G08B21/0266 (EP,US);
G08B21/0283 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | H01M50/576, G08B13/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | MANIPULATIONSSICHERE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/50] | English: | AN ANTI-TAMPERING DEVICE | [2022/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTI-FALSIFICATION | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2017130128 (M AND M LICENCING LTD [GB]); | [XI]US2019012892 (CARLSON JULIAN PAUL [CA], et al); | [XI]EP3493170 (BOEING CO [US]) | International search | [X]WO9418039 (HAGGERT HORST JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1-49 * abstract; figures 1-5; description of figures; claims 1-38 *; | [X]US2004239502 (YAMAUCHI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-49 * abstract; figures 1-12; description of figures; claims 1-16 1 *; | [X]DE102011013182 (SCHOPF WALTER [DE]) [X] 1-49 * abstract; figures 1-3; description of figures; claims 1-10 *; | [X]CN104477280 (UNIV JIANGSU SCIENCE & TECH) [X] 1-49 * abstract in English; figures 1-2; description of figures; claims 1-5 *; | [X]CN206650490U (TANGREN COMMUNICATION TECH SERVICES CO LTD) [X] 1-49* abstract in English; figures 1-2; description of figures; claims 1-5 *; | [XP]DE102019202795 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XP] 1-49 * abstract; figures 1-3; description of figures; claims 1-10 * |