EP4109700 - SYSTEM PLANNING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND SYSTEM PLANNING ASSISTANCE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUENAGA, Shinya c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
TADA, Yasuyuki c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
MIYATA, Yasushi c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
ICHIKAWA, Tsubasa c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21757078.7 | 20.01.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021JP01909 | Priority number, date | JP20200028397 | 21.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020028397 | [2022/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021166534 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109700 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00, G06Q50/06 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP);
G06Q10/0639 (EP);
G06Q50/06 (EP);
H02J13/00001 (EP);
H02J13/00002 (EP);
H02J3/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEMPLANUNGSHILFE-SYSTEM UND SYSTEMPLANUNGSHILFE-VERFAHREN | [2022/52] | English: | SYSTEM PLANNING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND SYSTEM PLANNING ASSISTANCE METHOD | [2022/52] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA PLANIFICATION DE SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AIDE À LA PLANIFICATION DE SYSTÈME | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2022 | Translation filed | 21.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2017063089 (SHIMAKURA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-11 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0111] * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]US2019148977 (KURODA EISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4* paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0120] * | International search | [A]CN102214922 (SHANDONG ELEC POWER RES INST) [A] 1-11 * , whole document *; | [A]CN105186541 (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST SICHUAN ELECTRIC POWER CORP, et al) [A] 1-11 * , whole document *; | [A]JP2016130928 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-11 * , whole document *; | [A]WO2019119775 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]) [A] 1-11 * , whole document *; | [EA]WO2021020012 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [EA] 1-11* , whole document *; | [A] - SUENAGA, SHINYA et al., "Realization of online voltage profile optimization", IEEJ Transactions on Power and Energy, (20190401), vol. 139, no. 4, doi:10.1541/ieejpes.139.251, pages 251 - 258, XP009530745 [A] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1541/ieejpes.139.251 | by applicant | JP2020028397 |