EP4107900 - UPLINK PRE-CODING BASED WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Fang 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
KHOSHNEVISAN, Mostafa 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
NAM, Wooseok 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21757439.1 | 20.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021CN77049 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN76160 | 21.02.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/076160 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021164764 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107900 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B7/0404, H04B7/0417, H04B7/0426 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04B7/0404 (EP,US);
H04B7/0421 (EP,US);
H04B7/0426 (EP,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | AUF UPLINK-VORCODIERUNG BASIERTE DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION | [2022/52] | English: | UPLINK PRE-CODING BASED WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2022/52] | French: | COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL BASÉES SUR UN PRÉCODAGE DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2020020120 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-13,15 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0106] * [A] 3,14[I] 4-8 | International search | [A]CN104488210 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105144613 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN108809578 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * description paragraphs 0098-0137 *; | [A]WO2019051825 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A] - AT&T, "Overview of Physical Layer Enhancements for NR URLLC", 3GPP Draft; R1-1809055 Overview of Physical Layer enhancements for NR URLLC, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20180811), vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, XP051516425 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * |