EP4107111 - AIRCRAFT GANTRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson, Daniel 16317 Redington Drive Redington Beach, FL 33708 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Bates, Daniel Joseph Ogive Intellectual Property Ltd 34 Westgate North Cave Brough HU15 2NJ / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21757587.7 | 15.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021US18115 | Priority number, date | US202016797758 | 21.02.2020 Original published format: US202016797758 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021167863 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107111 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B64F5/40, B64F5/60, B66F11/04 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
B64F5/40 (EP,US);
B64F5/60 (EP,US);
B66F11/04 (EP);
E04G3/28 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | B66F5/00, B66F5/04, B66F7/00, B66F7/04, B64F5/00, B64F5/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGPORTALSYSTEM | [2022/52] | English: | AIRCRAFT GANTRY SYSTEM | [2022/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PORTIQUE D'AÉRONEF | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 20.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4235305 (NYGREN GUNNAR [SE]); | [A]US4821845 (DEVIARIS GUY [FR]); | [XY]US5165504 (LECORRE YVES [FR]); | [A]US5248341 (BERRY JR HENRY K [US], et al); | [Y]WO2005085068 (FAHRION OTMAR [DE]); | [Y]CN206407871U (DUAN YIN); | [Y]US2019360219 (O'KEEFE JAMES MICHAEL [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4235305 (NYGREN GUNNAR [SE]) [A] 1-5* ; entire document *; | [A]US4821845 (DEVIARIS GUY [FR]) [A] 1-5 * ; entire document *; | [XY]US5165504 (LECORRE YVES [FR]) [X] 1-2, 5 * ; figures 1-2; column 1, lines 6-19; column 3, lines 1-44 * [Y] 3-4; | [Y]US5248341 (BERRY JR HENRY K [US], et al) [Y] 4 * ; figure 1; column 6, lines 55-66; column 8, lines 1-19 *; | [Y]CN206407871U (DUAN YIN) [Y] 3 * ; see machine translation * |