EP4192226 - GREENABLE WALL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wegenast, Klaus Turnseestrasse 2 79102 Freiburg / DE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21758348.3 | 04.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP71758 | Priority number, date | DE202010121022 | 10.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020121022 | [2023/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022033935 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192226 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02, E01F8/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
A01G9/025 (EP,US);
E01F8/021 (EP);
E04B1/80 (US);
Y02P60/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | BEGRÜNBARES WANDELEMENT | [2023/24] | English: | GREENABLE WALL ELEMENT | [2023/24] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE PAROI CULTIVABLE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 10.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]AU2010236051 (SYDNEY ORGANIC GARDENS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * page 10, line 23 - page 13, line 6; figures 1-7 * [I] 4,5,7; | [A]WO2016142283 (MARINELLI SERGIO [IT]) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 7 - page 6, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]EP3228185 (DIRIM [FR]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-5 *; | [XP]EP3786362 (WEGENAST KLAUS [DE]) [XP] 1-6,8,10-16* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-13 *; | [XI] - Sprich, "Lamellenrost", (20170601), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.sprich.ch/assets/documents/Datenblaetter/Gitterroste/Lamellenrost_Wasserzeichen.pdf, (20211117), XP055862873 [X] 1-3,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 4,5 | by applicant | WO2016142283 |