EP4171311 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PERFORMING PAYMENT TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Block, Inc. 1955 Broadway, Suite 600 Oakland, CA 94612 / US | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REZAYEE, Afshin San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 02 /
BIDARI, Emad San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 03 /
TEMPLETON, Thomas San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 04 /
LAMFALUSI, Michael San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 05 /
MAIBACH, Matthew H. San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 06 /
DOROGUSKER, Jesse L. San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | St Clair Jones, Gregory Arthur Langley, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21758487.9 | 16.07.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021US42054 | Priority number, date | US202063052937P | 16.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063052937 P | US202117219570 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: US202117219570 | US202117246329 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: US202117246329 | US202117246342 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: US202117246342 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022016104 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4171311 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A44C9/00, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/34, G07F7/08, H01Q1/22, H01Q1/27, G06K19/077, H04B1/3827 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G06Q20/321 (EP,US);
G06K19/0709 (US);
G06K19/0712 (US);
G06K19/0726 (US);
G06K19/07762 (EP,US);
G06K19/07779 (EP,US);
G06K7/10148 (US);
G06K7/10297 (US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G06Q20/352 (EP);
G06Q20/401 (US);
G06Q20/409 (US);
G07F7/0806 (EP);
H01Q1/273 (EP,US);
H04B5/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON ZAHLUNGSTRANSAKTIONEN | [2023/18] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PERFORMING PAYMENT TRANSACTIONS | [2023/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER DES TRANSACTIONS DE PAIEMENT | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 27.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2024/08] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014266624 (VAN BOSCH JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2016020832 (TING SHAO-CHIEH [TW]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2016171201 (SCHRÖDER SÖNKE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2016111897 (APPLE INC [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]EP3091606 (NXP BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2017277990 (TOKUNAGA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2018020055 (FIFTH DIMENSION DIGITAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2020114076 (INVENTEC APPLIANCES PUDONG [CN], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13,15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0019] - [0051] * [I] 1-15; | US2021289897 [ ] (HSU CHUN-CHIEH [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0027] - [0051] * | by applicant | US9861314 |