Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022038015 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN104695 | 06.07.2021 | EP20198907 | 29.09.2020 | CN202010834506 | 18.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023303801 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN104695 | 06.07.2021 | EP20198907 | 29.09.2020 | WO2021EP72397 | 11.08.2021 | CN202010834506 | 18.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3974460 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20198907 | 29.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116171296 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN104695 | 06.07.2021 | EP20198907 | 29.09.2020 | WO2021EP72397 | 11.08.2021 | CN202010834506 | 18.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114075318 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010834506 | 18.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4200345 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN104695 | 06.07.2021 | EP20198907 | 29.09.2020 | WO2021EP72397 | 11.08.2021 | CN202010834506 | 18.08.2020 |