EP4200345 - A METHOD FOR STABLY STORING AN ISOCYANURATE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Guobin Shanghai, 201204 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yi Qing Shanghai, 201601 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Xiaojun Shanghai, 200237 / CN | 04 /
GU, Yongming Shanghai, 201208 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, John Shanghai, 201206 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21758688.2 | 11.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021EP72397 | Priority number, date | CN202010834506 | 18.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010834506 | EP20200198907 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20198907 | WO2021CN104695 | 06.07.2021 Original published format: PCT/CN2021/104695 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022038015 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200345 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/02, C08G18/67, C08G18/76, C08G18/79 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C08G18/022 (EP);
C08K5/005 (US);
C08G18/3215 (US);
C08G18/3848 (US);
C08G18/672 (EP);
C08G18/7664 (EP);
C08G18/794 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STABILEN LAGERUNG EINER ISOCYANURATZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/26] | English: | A METHOD FOR STABLY STORING AN ISOCYANURATE COMPOSITION | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE STABLE D'UNE COMPOSITION D'ISOCYANURATE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 20.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE2358503 (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-8 * example 1 * [A] 9-15; | [XA]US10108090 (YONEZAWA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * figure 1; claim 1; table 1 *[A] 9-15 | by applicant | US5821296 | CN101675099 | CN101974307 |