EP4192676 - MACHINE AND METHOD TO MAKE TUBULAR PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.M.A. Industria Macchine Automatiche S.p.A. Via Emilia 428-442 40064 Ozzano dell'Emilia (BO) / IT | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAGHETTI, Fiorenzo 40064 OZZANO DELL'EMILIA / IT | 02 /
ZANETTIN MISLEY, Federico 40064 OZZANO DELL'EMILIA / IT | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21759173.4 | 03.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021IT50245 | Priority number, date | IT20200019141 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: IT202000019141 | [2023/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022029817 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192676 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4192676 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B31C3/00, B31D5/00 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
B31C3/00 (EP);
B31D5/0095 (EP);
B31F5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ROHRFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTEN | [2023/24] | English: | MACHINE AND METHOD TO MAKE TUBULAR PRODUCTS | [2023/24] | French: | MACHINE ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À FABRIQUER DES PRODUITS TUBULAIRES | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1698260 (DE SMITH HENRY); | [A]US2931278 (IGNELL ROLF L); | [A]FR2303663 (FIBERPOT AB [SE]); | [A]EP1080874 (SONOCO DEV INC [US]); | [A]JP2002028995 (FUJI ELECTRONIC IND) |