EP4205103 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A REVERBERATION AUDIO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liquid Oxigen (Lox) B.V. Karthuizersstraat 153 1015 LP Amsterdam / NL | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOMEN, Paulus 1015 LP Amsterdam / NL | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21759422.5 | 26.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021NL50523 | Priority number, date | NL20202026361 | 28.08.2020 Original published format: NL 2026361 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022045888 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205103 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4205103 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10K15/08, H04S7/00, G10K11/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G10K15/08 (EP,KR,US);
G10K11/002 (EP,KR);
H04S7/302 (US);
H04S7/305 (EP,KR,US);
H04S7/306 (EP,KR);
H04S7/307 (US);
H04S2400/11 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES NACHHALLAUDIOSIGNALS | [2023/27] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING A REVERBERATION AUDIO SIGNAL | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO DE RÉVERBÉRATION | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 17.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003007648 (CURRELL CHRISTOPHER [US]); | [A]US2005100171 (REILLY ANDREW P [AU], et al); | [A]US2017238119 (SCHLECHT SEBASTIAN [DE], et al); | [A]US10524080 (JOHNSON MARTIN E [US], et al); | by applicant | US2008273708 | US2013216073 | US2015078563 | EP3026666 | WO2016130834 | NL20192024434 | NL20202025950 |