EP4113079 - BLACK SILICON CARBIDE CERAMIC BASED THERMOELECTRIC PHOTODETECTOR, OPTICAL POWER METER AND OPTICAL ENERGY METER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shandong Xinyuan Photoelectric Technology Co., Ltd. High-Tech Electronic Industry Park Tangcheng County Linyi, Shandong 276100 / CN | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Delong No.3 Yongtaizhuang East Road, Haidian District Beijing 100096 / CN | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21759552.9 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021CN78269 | Priority number, date | CN202010130728 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010130728 | CN202010366053 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010366053 | CN202020708298U | 30.04.2020 Original published format: CN 202020708298 U | [2023/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021170112 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113079 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/42, G01J5/02, G01J5/12, G01J5/08 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G01J1/4257 (EP,CN);
G01J5/12 (EP,US);
G01J1/44 (CN);
G01J5/0215 (EP);
G01J5/0853 (EP);
H10N10/01 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | G01J1/42, G01J1/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | AUF SCHWARZSILICIUMCARBIDKERAMIK BASIERENDER THERMOELEKTRISCHER PHOTODETEKTOR, OPTISCHER LEISTUNGSMESSER UND OPTISCHER ENERGIEMESSER | [2023/01] | English: | BLACK SILICON CARBIDE CERAMIC BASED THERMOELECTRIC PHOTODETECTOR, OPTICAL POWER METER AND OPTICAL ENERGY METER | [2023/01] | French: | PHOTODÉTECTEUR THERMOÉLECTRIQUE À BASE DE CÉRAMIQUE DE CARBURE DE SILICIUM NOIR, COMPTEUR DE PUISSANCE OPTIQUE ET COMPTEUR D'ÉNERGIE OPTIQUE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2022 | Translation filed | 27.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 26.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE10339952 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 5; | [A]US2013250997 (GREENFIELD EPHRAIM [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0074]; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]WO2018234411 (LASER POINT S R L [IT]) [X] 1,10,11 * figures 1a,b,c * [I] 2-9,12-15; | [XI]CN209264113U (HANGZHOU BOYUAN PHOTOELECTRICAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [I] 2-15 | International search | [A]DE10339952 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-19* entire document *; | [A]CN104535197 (HANGZHOU SILAN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]CN108007580 (SHANGHAI INST MICROSYSTEM & INFORMATION TECH CAS) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]CN108540046 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [X]CN110770550 (LASER POINT S R L) [X] 1-19 * description, paragraphs [0001]-[0038], [0045]-[0078], figures 1-3 *; | [PX]CN111174908 (LI DELONG) [PX] 1-3, 16-18 * description, paragraphs [0033]-[0047], and figures 1-8 *; | [PX]CN111551247 (LI DELONG) [PX] 2, 4, 9-15 * claims 1-15 *; | [PX]CN211717619U (LI DELONG) [PX] 1-3, 16-18 * description, paragraphs [0043]-[0057], and figures 1-8 * |