EP4110985 - SULFURIC ACID COMPOSITION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sixring Inc. 1500, 140 - 10 Avenue SE Calgary, AB T2G 0R1 / CA | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PURDY, Clay 20 Chinook Place SW Medicine Hat, AB T1A 8S1 / CA | 02 /
WEISSENBERGER, Markus 19 Copperstone Blvd SE Calgary, AB T2Z 0G7 / CA | 03 /
WYNNYK, Kyle, G. 10 Hamlet Road SW Calgary, AB T2V 3C8 Canada / CA | 04 /
DAWSON, Karl, W. 106 Hawklance Pl NW Calgary, AB T3G 3R8 / CA | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21759771.5 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021CA00016 | Priority number, date | CA20203074199 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: CA 3074199 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021168536 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110985 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D21C3/06, C01B17/69, C09K3/00, D21C3/22 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
D21C1/04 (EP,GB,IL,KR);
C01B17/69 (CZ,IL,KR,US);
D21C3/06 (EP,CZ,GB,IL,KR);
D21C3/04 (IL,US);
C09K3/00 (CZ);
D21B1/021 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | D21C3/06, C01B17/69, C09K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | SCHWEFELSÄUREZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/01] | English: | SULFURIC ACID COMPOSITION AND USES THEREOF | [2023/01] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ACIDE SULFURIQUE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2175621 (LION CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3045476 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2016264420 (DINDI HASAN [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045]; claims 1-20 * [I] 2-15; | [A]EP3396063 (ETH ZUERICH [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4626319 (KRUEGER HORST [DE], et al) [A] 0* (*column 5*) *; | [X]CA2134270 (MARSULEX INC [CA]) [X] 1, 3-5 and 9 * (* pages 3-5*) *; | [X]CN103572306 (BYD CO LTD) [X] 1-5 and 9 * (* Machine translation abstract*) *; | [X]CN103820796 (DONGGUAN KAIMENG SURFACE TREAT TECHNOLOGY DEV LTD COMPANY) [X] 1-5 and 9 * (* Machine Translation abstract*) *; | [X]CA2923100 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1, 3-5 and 9 * (*page 1 and page 4*) *; | [X]CN109877097 (WENGFU DAZHOU CHEM CO LTD) [X] 3-5 and 9 * (* machine translation claim 5*) * |