EP4091780 - SLITTER DEVICE, SLITTER-HEAD POSITIONING METHOD, AND BOX MAKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Machinery Systems, Ltd. 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yasunari c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES MACHINERY SYSTEMS LTD., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | 02 /
TANCHI, Masayoshi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES MACHINERY SYSTEMS LTD., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | 03 /
NADACHI, Mitsuhiro c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES MACHINERY SYSTEMS LTD., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8585 / JP | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21759969.5 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021JP03088 | Priority number, date | JP20200033731 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020033731 | [2022/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021171895 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091780 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/24, B26D5/06, B26D7/22, B26D7/26, B31B50/20, B26D3/08, B26D5/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B26D1/245 (EP);
B31B50/20 (EP,US);
B26D1/24 (EP);
B26D3/085 (EP);
B26D5/00 (EP);
B26D5/06 (EP);
B26D7/22 (EP);
B26D7/26 (EP);
B26D7/2635 (EP);
B26D7/2642 (EP);
B31B50/006 (EP,US);
B31B50/04 (EP,US);
B31B50/25 (US);
B31B50/88 (US);
B31B2100/00 (US);
B31B2100/0022 (EP);
B31B2110/35 (EP);
B31B2120/302 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | B26D1/24, B26D5/06, B26D7/22, B26D7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | TELLERMESSER, VERFAHREN ZUM POSITIONIEREN VON TELLERMESSERKÖPFEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KARTONS | [2022/47] | English: | SLITTER DEVICE, SLITTER-HEAD POSITIONING METHOD, AND BOX MAKING MACHINE | [2022/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE, PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT DE TÊTE DE DISPOSITIF DE COUPE ET MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE BOÎTE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2022 | Translation filed | 19.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3093037 (WARD JR HENRY D) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4261239 (TOBOSHI KATSUMASA, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 39 - column 6, line 26; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]JPH04201195 (ISOWA KK) [AD] 1-12 * page 772 - page 778; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP3260254 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND PRINTING [JP]) [A] 13* paragraph [0034]; figure 1; claim 11 * | International search | [YA]JPS5579134 (NIPPON DENSHI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-5,7-14 * 2 19-4 6, 1-3 * [A] 6; | [YA]JPS5683397 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG) [Y] 1-5,7-14 * 5 8 -15 2, 1-2 * [A] 6; | [YA]JPH0259295 (RENGO CO LTD) [Y] 2-5,7-12,14 * 2 9 5 1 1,1 - 5 * [A] 6; | [YA]JPH02124293 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 1-5,7-14 * 1 - 4 * [A] 6; | [Y]JP2004330351 (ISOWA INDUSTRY CO) [Y] 10-12, 14 * [0 0 2 7] - [0 0 2 9] *; | [Y]WO2019116578 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND MACH SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [Y] 14* [0 0 0 2] * | by applicant | JPH04201195 |