Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023073751 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP03088 | 28.01.2021 | JP2020033731 | 28.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115135472B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | B | CN115135472 | 30.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP03088 | 28.01.2021 | JP2020033731 | 28.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4091780 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2023 | A4 | EP4091780 | 23.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP03088 | 28.01.2021 | JP2020033731 | 28.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021171895 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020033731 | 28.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7449719B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2024 | B2 | JP2021133483 | 13.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020033731 | 28.02.2020 |