EP4110795 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IDENTIFYING TRAITS USING A CELL-FREE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synvitrobio, Inc. 1933 Davis St, Suite 223 San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Zachary Z. c/o Synvitrobio, Inc. 1933 Davis St., Suite 223 San Leandro, California 94577 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21760040.2 | 01.03.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US20293 | Priority number, date | US202062983007P | 28.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062983007 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021174199 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110795 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/415, C12Q1/6865 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP);
C12N15/1062 (US);
C12N15/1058 (EP,US);
C12N15/1075 (EP);
C40B40/08 (EP);
C40B50/06 (EP);
C12P21/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON MERKMALEN MITTELS EINES ZELLFREIEN SYSTEMS | [2023/01] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IDENTIFYING TRAITS USING A CELL-FREE SYSTEM | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR IDENTIFIER DES CARACTÈRES À L'AIDE D'UN SYSTÈME ACELLULAIRE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 13.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02089498 (SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claim, p.12 par.4 *; | [X]WO03037302 (WINDSOR J BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * par.10-13, 25-26, 42-45, claims *; | [X]WO2005108615 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * pp.84-86, 112, 132-148 *; | [X]EP3040418 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims, par.80-88 *; | [X]WO2016183029 (ILLUMINA INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * example 2 *; | [X]WO2016187466 (INVENRA INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * examples 1-2, 4-5 *; | [X]WO2018154021 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB]) [X] 1-15 * claims, examples *; | [X]WO2018165159 (SYNVITROBIO INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figure 6, par.111-125 ,example 1) *; | [X]US2020048629 (GREENLEAF WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims, in particular claims 52-54 *; | [X] - RAMACHANDRAN NIROSHAN ET AL, "Self-assembling protein microarrays", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, (20040702), vol. 305, no. 5680, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1097639, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 86 - 90, XP002441078 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1097639 | International search | [Y]US2006053512 (BAO XIAOMING [US], et al) [Y] 4-5* . para [0207], para [0215]. *; | [XY]US2018237847 (CULLER STEPHANIE [US], et al) [X] 1, 3/1, 6-7, 8/1, 9-19, 22- 24 * . para [0004], para [0006], para [0015] - para [0016], para [0024], para [0066], para [0082]-[0083], para [0087], para [0092] - para [0095], para [0097], para [0110], para [0116], para [0124], para [0130], para [0167], para [0194], para [0197], para [0204], para [0265] * [Y] 2, 3/2, 4, 5, 8/2, 20-21; | [Y] - POPOVA Blagovesta, Schubert Steffen, Bulla Ingo, Buchwald Daniela, Kramer Wilfried, "A Robust and Versatile Method of Combinatorial Chemical Synthesis of Gene Libraries via Hierarchical Assembly of Partially Randomized Modules", PLOS ONE, (20150910), vol. 10, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0136778, pages 1 - 27, XP055855333 [Y] 2, 3/2, 4/2, 5/2, 8/2 * . pg 21, para 1, pg 22, para 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0136778 | [Y] - CRAIG R. A., Lu J., Luo J., Shi L., Liao L., "Optimizing nucleotide sequence ensembles for combinatorial protein libraries using a genetic algorithm", Nucleic Acids Research, (20100100), vol. 38, no. 2, doi:10.1093/nar/gkp906, pages 1 - 9, XP055855355 [Y] 20 * . pg 2, col 1, para 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkp906 | [Y] - GAN et al., "A combined cell -free transcription-translation system from Saccharomyces cerevisiae for rapid and robust protein synthesis", Biotechnol. J, (20140500), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:10.1002/biot.201300545, pages 641 - 651, XP055377623 [Y] 21 * . pg 641, abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.201300545 |