EP4112430 - SADDLE-TYPE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Tsutomu c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21760524.5 | 25.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021JP07077 | Priority number, date | JP20200030103 | 26.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020030103 | [2023/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021172422 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112430 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4112430 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B62J37/00, B62J35/00, B62K11/10 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B62J35/00 (EP);
B62J37/00 (EP);
B62K11/10 (EP);
B62K2202/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SATTELFAHRZEUG | [2023/01] | English: | SADDLE-TYPE VEHICLE | [2023/01] | French: | VÉHICULE DE TYPE À SELLE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2022 | Translation filed | 20.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 20.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2221206 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP2176115 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP2167367 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2003182674 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [A]JP2003182675 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [A]JP2003246287 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2010013479 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]JP2013071471 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD)[A] 1-10; | [A]JP2016016736 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10 | by applicant | JP2003237663 | JP2010215214 |