EP4087168 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOU, Chong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
FAN, Qiang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Qufang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21760668.0 | 01.03.2021 | [2022/45] | WO2021CN78432 | Priority number, date | CN202010130397 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010130397 | CN202110215182 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110215182 | [2022/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021170136 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087168 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/1822, H04L1/1829, H04L5/00, // H04W52/02 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/1812 (CN,US);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04W52/0225 (CN);
H04W52/0229 (EP,CN);
H04W76/27 (CN);
H04W76/28 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | H04L1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/45] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2022 | Translation filed | 03.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 16.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3334122 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0084] , [0 92] , [0 94] , [0 95] , [ 107] , [ 109] , [ 11113] * * figures 4, 5 * [I] 4,5,9; | [XI]EP3614600 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,6-15 * paragraphs [0061] , [0 73] - [0079] - [ 101] * [I] 4; | [XI] - OPPO, "Discussion on CG and SPS in NTN", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, (20191108), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1915166, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_108/Docs/R2-1915166.zip R2-1915166.doc, (20191108), XP051817062 [X] 1-4,6-8,10-15 * the whole document * [I] 9 | International search | [A]CN107534527 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [A] 1-31 * entire document *; | [A]CN109565366 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-31 * entire document *; | [A]CN109716694 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-31 * entire document *; | [A]US2019313380 (YE SHIANG-RUNG [TW]) [A] 1-31* entire document *; | [PX]CN110890943 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-31 * claim 1, description paragraphs [0007]-[0026] *; | [PX]CN112399588 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-31 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0009] *; | [X] - Anonymous, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Physical layer procedures for control (Release 15)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Specification; 3GPP TS 38.213, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20200111), vol. RAN WG1, no. V15.8.0, pages 1 - 109, XP051860646 [X] 1-31 * section 9.1.2 * | [X] - Nokia, Nokia Shanghai Bell, "On remaining details of BWPs and CA", 3GPP Draft; R1-1808953_BWPs_and_CA_NOK, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20180810), vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, XP051516328 [X] 1-31 * sections 1-3 * |