EP4110793 - GENETICALLY ENGINEERED MICROORGANISMS THAT OVEREXPRESS MICROCIN-MGE AND METHODS OF PURIFICATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | For all designated states University Of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCCI, Vanni 362 Border Road Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US | 02 /
MORTZFELD, Benedikt, M. 29A Arlington St. Newton, Massachusetts 02458 / US | 03 /
PALMER, Jacob 11a Circus Street Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 1JR / GB | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21760771.2 | 23.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US19225 | Priority number, date | US202062980921P | 24.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062980921 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021173545 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110793 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/195, C07K14/245, A23B4/22 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/26 (EP);
C12P21/02 (US);
A61K38/12 (EP);
A61P31/04 (US);
C07K14/245 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (US);
C12N15/70 (US);
A23L3/3463 (EP);
A23L3/34635 (EP);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2319/21 (EP);
C07K2319/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | GENETISCH MANIPULIERTE MIKROORGANISMEN, DIE MIKROCIN-MGE ÜBEREXPRIMIEREN, UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2023/01] | English: | GENETICALLY ENGINEERED MICROORGANISMS THAT OVEREXPRESS MICROCIN-MGE AND METHODS OF PURIFICATION AND USE | [2023/01] | French: | MICRO-ORGANISMES GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉS SUREXPRIMANT LA MICROCINE-MGE ET MÉTHODES DE PURIFICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO2019055781 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]) [XD] 6-13 * the whole document * * page 9 * * page 26 - page 30 * * examples 1,4 * * figure 9 * [Y] 14,15; | [X] - C GAGGERO ET AL, "Genetic analysis of microcin H47 antibiotic system.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, US, (19930101), vol. 175, no. 17, doi:10.1128/JB.175.17.5420-5427.1993, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 5420 - 5427, XP055719019 [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * * figures 2,4b * * page 5426, column 1, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.175.17.5420-5427.1993 | [Y] - BANTYSH OLGA ET AL, "Enzymatic Synthesis of Bioinformatically Predicted Microcin C-Like Compounds Encoded by Diverse Bacteria", MBIO, US, vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1128/mBio.01059-14, ISSN 2161-2129, (20140701), URL: https://journals.asm.org/doi/pdf/10.1128/mBio.01059-14, XP093136897 [Y] 14,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 9, column 1, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/mBio.01059-14 | [ID] - Palmer J. ET AL, "Microcin H47: A Class IIb Microcin with Potent Activity Against Multi-Drug Resistant Enterobacteriaceae.", (20191013), URL: https://zenodo.org/records/3483827, (20240229), XP093136301 [ID] 1-15 * the whole document * | [ ] - Palmer J. ET AL, "Plasmid pHMT-H47 DNA sequence", (20191013), URL: https://zenodo.org/records/3483827, XP093136306 [ ] * sequence . * | [ ] - Palmer J. ET AL, "Plasmid pS4BAD-H47 DNA sequence", (20191013), URL: https://zenodo.org/records/3483827, (20240229), XP093136375 [ ] * sequence . * | [XP] - PALMER JACOB D. ET AL, "Microcin H47: A Class IIb Microcin with Potent Activity Against Multidrug Resistant Enterobacteriaceae", ACS INFECTIOUS DISEASES, US, vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1021/acsinfecdis.9b00302, ISSN 2373-8227, (20200225), pages 672 - 679, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/acsinfecdis.9b00302, XP055925977 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsinfecdis.9b00302 | International search | [Y]US2006269988 (ROYER MONIQUE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3* para [0149]; Claim 37 *; | [Y] - NOLAN et al., "Biosynthetic Tailoring of Microcin E492m: Post-Translational Modification Affords an Antibacterial Siderophore-Peptide Conjugate", J Am Chem Soc., (20071121), vol. 129, no. 46, doi:10.1021/ja074650f, pages 14336 - 14347, XP055100549 [Y] 1-3 * . Especially pg 14336, col 1, para 1; pg 14338, col 1, para 1; pg 14339, col 1, para 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja074650f |