EP4114087 - SCREEN PROJECTION METHOD, RECEIVING END DEVICE, AND SENDING END DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Hikvision Digital Technology Co., Ltd. No. 555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Pengfei No.555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Kefeng No.555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 03 /
LI, Wanjiaman No.555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21761385.0 | 22.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021CN77209 | Priority number, date | CN202010120292 | 26.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010120292 | [2023/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021169907 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114087 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, H04W8/00, // H04W4/80, H04W48/16, H04W76/10 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04W8/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/1454 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W4/80 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,CN);
H04W76/14 (KR);
G09G2358/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | H04W48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | BILDSCHIRMPROJEKTIONSVERFAHREN, EMPFANGSSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG UND SENDESEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/01] | English: | SCREEN PROJECTION METHOD, RECEIVING END DEVICE, AND SENDING END DEVICE | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROJECTION D'ÉCRAN, DISPOSITIF D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE RÉCEPTION ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRÉMITÉ D'ENVOI | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | Translation filed | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN106534547 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]US2018183840 (LEE JANGHWAN [US]); | [X]US2018196596 (CHOI MINKYU [KR], et al); | [XA]US2019362314 (CHEN HANG [CN]) | International search | [A]US2013268624 (YAGIURA YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [X]CN108428027 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD) [X] 1-16 * description, paragraphs [0048]-[0073] *; | [A]CN109525990 (TONGCHENG NETWORK TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-16* entire document *; | [A]CN110740288 (DINGTALK HOLDING CAYMAN LTD) [A] 1-16 * entire document * |