EP4112505 - ARTICLE CONVEYANCE CLASSIFICATION APPARATUS, ARTICLE CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM, AND CONTROL SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Masataka c/o Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation, 72-34, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | 02 /
AOKI, Takashi c/o Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation, 72-34, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstraße 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21761519.4 | 17.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021JP05924 | Priority number, date | JP20200030401 | 26.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020030401 | [2023/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021172130 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112505 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137, B65G43/00, B65G43/08, B65G47/04, B65G47/46, B65G47/68, B65G47/70, B07C5/36, G06Q10/08 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B65G47/46 (EP,US);
B65G43/10 (US);
B07C5/36 (EP);
B65G43/08 (EP);
G06Q10/08 (EP);
B65G2201/02 (US);
B65G2203/025 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | B65G1/137, B65G43/00, B65G43/08, B65G47/04, B65G47/46, B65G47/68, B65G47/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KLASSIFIZIEREN DER FÖRDERUNG VON ARTIKELN, SYSTEM ZUR KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON ARTIKELN UND STEUERUNGSSERVER | [2023/01] | English: | ARTICLE CONVEYANCE CLASSIFICATION APPARATUS, ARTICLE CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM, AND CONTROL SERVER | [2023/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE CLASSIFICATION DE TRANSPORT D'ARTICLES, SYSTÈME DE CLASSIFICATION D'ARTICLES ET SERVEUR DE COMMANDE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2022 | Translation filed | 17.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 12.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0110574 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7* figure - *; | [XA]WO2015032402 (CRISPLANT AS [DK]) [X] 1,4,5,7 * figure - * [A] 2,3,6 | International search | [A]JPH08198436 (TOYO KANETSU KK) [A] 1-7; | [Y]JP2012201502 (AISIN AW CO) [Y] 1, 3-5, 7 * paragraphs [0016], [0032]-[0033], fig. 1, 4 *; | [A]US2014364998 (NEISER RAYMOND R [US], et al)[A] 1-7; | [YA]JP2016060626 (TOYO KANETSU SOLUTIONS KK) [Y] 1, 3-5, 7 * paragraphs [0022]-[0032], [0039]-[0062], [0070]-[0075], fig. 1-4 * [A] 2, 6; | [Y]JP2017024812 (YANMAR CO LTD) [Y] 1, 3-5, 7 * paragraphs [0007], [0010]-[0011], fig. 1-2 *; | [Y]JP2017039170 (LIFE ROBOTICS CO LTD) [Y] 1, 3-5, 7 * paragraph [0009], fig. 1 *; | [A]US2019151901 (VEGH MARK KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2019189426 (TOYO KANETSU SOLUTIONS KK) [A] 1-7 | by applicant | JPH08198436 |