EP4113656 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERIES, AND SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UKA, Youichirou c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
OKAZAKI, Tomohisa c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21761860.2 | 25.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021JP07139 | Priority number, date | JP20200034119 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020034119 | [2023/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021172441 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113656 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/131, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/0566 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODE FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2023/01] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERIES, AND SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/01] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIES SECONDAIRES ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2022 | Translation filed | 20.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - HOU AOLIN ET AL, "NH4F and carbon nanotubes co-modified LiNi0.88Co0.09Al0.03O2cathode material with enhanced electrochemical properties for Li-ion batteries", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN ELECTRONICS, CHAPMAN AND HALL, LONDON, GB, vol. 30, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S10854-019-00704-7, ISSN 0957-4522, (20190116), pages 4128 - 4136, (20190116), XP036720401 [X] 1,4,5,7 * title; abstract; fig. 5(c); pp 4129f * [I] 3,6,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10854-019-00704-7 | [A] - YU JIANLIN ET AL, "Carbon Nanotubes Coating on LiNi0.8Co0.15Al0.05O2 as Cathode Materials for Lithium Battery", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTROCHEMICAL SCIENCE, Serbia, vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.20964/2017.12.04, ISSN 1452-3981, (20171201), pages 11892 - 11903, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.20964/2017.12.04, XP093058891 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.20964/2017.12.04 | International search | [Y]JP2006086116 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 1-9* , paragraphs [0033], [0034] *; | [XY]JP2013093288 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1-3, 6-9 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0060] * [Y] 4-5; | [Y]JP2017182989 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0064] * | by applicant | WO2008051667 |