EP4192912 - THERMOPLASTIC MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUBBELS, Erik 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
LEHENMEIER, Maximilian 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21761997.2 | 05.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP71929 | Priority number, date | EP20200190021 | 07.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20190021 | [2023/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022029260 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192912 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00, C08L67/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,KR);
C08L23/06 (KR);
C08L23/0876 (KR);
C08L2205/035 (US);
C08L2207/062 (KR,US);
C08L2207/066 (KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L23/06, C08L23/0876 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L23/06, C08L23/0876 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE MISCHUNGEN | [2023/24] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC MIXTURES | [2023/24] | French: | MÉLANGES THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5310787 (KUTSUWA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * example 1 * * claims 1,2,3 * * page 4, lines 7-12 * * column 5, lines 28-42 *; | [I]WO02061013 (DU PONT [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * claims 1-6 * * example 3 * * page 6, lines 12-29 *; | [AD] - JOSHI M. ET AL, "Polybutylene terephthalate/high-density polyethylene alloys. I. Morphological studies", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, US, (19910720), vol. 43, no. 2, doi:10.1002/app.1991.070430210, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 311 - 328, XP055861612 [AD] 1-12 * page 312; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1991.070430210 | by applicant | US3651014 | DE2842005 | DE3334782 | DE3506472 | EP0208187 | EP0365916 | WO9014391 | EP0419274 | US5272236 | DE4401055 | EP0711810 | EP0791606 | DE10054859 | EP1353986 | EP1722984 | - M. JOSHI et al., Journal of Applied Polymer Science, (19910000), vol. 43, pages 311 - 328 | - M. JOSHI et al., Journal of Applied Polymer Science, (19920000), vol. 45, pages 1837 - 1847 | - M. JOSHI et al., POLYMER, (19940000), vol. 35, no. 17, pages 3679 - 3685 | - Vinyl and Related Polymers, Wiley-Verlag, (19520000), page 484,494 |