EP4196288 - NOZZLE FOR SPRAYING CONCRETE OR SIMILAR MATERIAL, PORTIONS OF THE SAME AND STRUCTURE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobbot SA Route de la Glâne 26 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBEAUD, Thomas 1700 Fribourg / CH | 02 /
GALÉ, Benjamin 1700 Fribourg / CH | 03 /
PETIT, Agnès 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | KATZAROV S.A. Geneva Business Center 12 Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21762029.3 | 12.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021EP72476 | Priority number, date | EP20200191401 | 17.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20191401 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022038036 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4196288 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
B05B7/1481 (EP);
B28B1/001 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | DÜSE ZUM SPRITZEN VON BETON ODER ÄHNLICHEM MATERIAL, TEILE DAVON UND STRUKTURHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2023/25] | English: | NOZZLE FOR SPRAYING CONCRETE OR SIMILAR MATERIAL, PORTIONS OF THE SAME AND STRUCTURE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS USING THE SAME | [2023/25] | French: | BUSE PERMETTANT DE PULVÉRISER DU BÉTON OU UN MATÉRIAU SIMILAIRE, PARTIES DE CELLE-CI ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION DE STRUCTURE L'UTILISANT | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4923121 (BOYER HAROLD F [US]) [X] 1-8* abstract *; | [X]DE102010040526 (HUBER GERHARD [AT]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | WO03069898 | EP1570908 | US2015059408 |