EP4188287 - MULTI-LAYER FOLDING FLOW DIVERTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, Massachusetts 02767-0350 / US | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOROCHOW, Lacey Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21762094.7 | 28.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021IB56874 | Priority number, date | US202063059524P | 31.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063059524 P | US202117369014 | 07.07.2021 Original published format: US202117369014 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022024003 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188287 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/90, A61F2/844, A61B17/12 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
A61F2/90 (EP);
A61F2/06 (US);
A61B17/12109 (US);
A61B17/12177 (US);
A61F2/844 (EP);
A61F2/95 (US);
A61B17/12113 (US);
A61F2/07 (US);
A61F2/82 (US);
A61F2/962 (EP);
A61F2002/068 (US);
A61F2002/823 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE FALTBARE STRÖMUNGSUMLENKER | [2023/23] | English: | MULTI-LAYER FOLDING FLOW DIVERTERS | [2023/23] | French: | DÉFLECTEURS DE FLUX PLIANTS MULTICOUCHES | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 27.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102007012964 (PHENOX GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0030] , [0086] - [0090]; figure 10 *; | [A]WO2011023105 (MICROPORT MEDICAL SHANGHAI CO [CN], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0045] - [0047]; figure 5a *; | [XI]WO2013065040 (ENDOSPAN LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,7,10,14 * page 13, paragraph 20 - page 22, paragraph 7; figures 1-3F * [I] 9,17 | by applicant | US10076428 |