EP4214220 - ANTIMICROBIAL PEPTIDOMIMETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basilea Pharmaceutica International AG, Allschwil Hegenheimermattweg 167b 4123 Allschwil / CH | For all designated states Universität Zürich Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | [2024/20] |
Former [2023/30] | For all designated states Spexis AG Hegenheimermattweg 125 4123 Allschwil / CH | ||
For all designated states Universität Zürich Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBRECHT, Daniel 4112 Bättwil / CH | 02 /
LUTHER, Anatol 79589 Binzen / DE | 03 /
UPERT, Grégory 68680 Kembs / FR | 04 /
DESJONQUERES, Nicolas 68680 Kembs / FR | 05 /
BRABET, Emile 68300 Saint Louis / FR | 06 /
ZBINDEN, Peter 4312 Magden / CH | 07 /
ZERBE, Oliver 8057 Zürich / CH | 08 /
MÖHLE, Kerstin 8907 Wettswil / CH | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Thwaite, Jonathan Simon Basilea Pharmaceutica International Ltd. Allschwil Hegenheimermattweg 167b 4123 Allschwil / CH | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21762607.6 | 05.08.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021EP25301 | Priority number, date | EP20200020353 | 05.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20020353 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028737 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214220 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C07K14/47, A61P31/04, A61K38/00 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/43563 (US);
A01N37/46 (US);
A01P1/00 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Extension states | BA | 07.03.2023 | ME | 07.03.2023 | Validation states | MA | 07.03.2023 | MD | 07.03.2023 | TN | 07.03.2023 | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE PEPTIDOMIMETIKA | [2023/30] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL PEPTIDOMIMETICS | [2023/30] | French: | PEPTIDOMIMÉTIQUES À ACTIVITÉ ANTIMICROBIENNE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 21.03.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2024 | Decision despatched | 21.03.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 05.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 05.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 05.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101173005 (ZILONG SHEN [CN]); | [A]JP2011072294 (UNIV HOKKAIDO); |