EP4214553 - TECHNIQUES FOR MANUFACTURING VARIABLE ETCH DEPTH GRATINGS USING GRAY-TONE LITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states META PLATFORMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANKE, Elliott Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
MOHANTY, Nihar Ranjan Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
LANE, Austin Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
COLBURN, Matthew E. Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 05 /
VORA, Ankit Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21762910.4 | 06.08.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021US45043 | Priority number, date | US202017024072 | 17.09.2020 Original published format: US202017024072 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022060485 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214553 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18, G02B27/01 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G02B5/1857 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/0101 (EP,KR);
G02B27/0172 (KR,US);
G03F7/2022 (KR,US);
G03F7/70283 (KR,US);
G02B2027/0178 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GITTERN MIT VARIABLER ÄTZTIEFE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GRAUTONLITHOGRAPHIE | [2023/30] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR MANUFACTURING VARIABLE ETCH DEPTH GRATINGS USING GRAY-TONE LITHOGRAPHY | [2023/30] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE FABRICATION DE RÉSEAUX À PROFONDEUR DE GRAVURE VARIABLE FAISANT APPEL À LA LITHOGRAPHIE À TONS DE GRIS | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 21.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002122255 (OGUSU MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0088] - [0107] - [0127]; figures 2, 8 *; | [Y]EP2386841 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 9* paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0077]; figure 8 *; | [A]WO2018220270 (DISPELIX OY [FI]) [A] 1 * pages 2,8 - page 10; figures 1A-1C, 2A-2C *; | [XYI]US2020142120 (MEYER TIMMERMAN THIJSSEN RUTGER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0030] - paragraph [0041]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 4,9 [I] 3,5-8 |