EP4204531 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
RS
TR
Unilever Global IP Limited Port Sunlight Wirral, Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAINGER, David, Stephen Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
IKPATT, Uyai Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
STEVENSON, Paul, Simon Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 04 /
THORLEY, David, Christopher Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21763035.9 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021EP72221 | Priority number, date | EP20200193306 | 28.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20193306 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022043045 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4204531 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4204531 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/94, C11D1/92, C11D1/14, C11D3/37 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
C11D1/94 (EP,US);
C11D3/0036 (US);
C11D3/3715 (EP,US);
C11D3/3723 (US);
C11D1/143 (EP,US);
C11D1/146 (EP,US);
C11D1/22 (US);
C11D1/26 (US);
C11D1/29 (EP);
C11D1/662 (US);
C11D1/755 (US);
C11D1/92 (EP,US);
C11D2111/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/52] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION | [2023/27] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DÉTERGENT | [2023/52] |
Former [2023/27] | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2023/27] | COMPOSITION DÉTERGENTE | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 18.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB987795 (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | [A]US6172024 (ARVANITIDOU EVANGELIA [US]); | [A]US6514927 (LANG FRANK-PETER [DE], et al); | [A]DE102007030109 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) | by applicant | GB1296839 | GB1372034 | US4435307 | EP0218272 | EP0258068 | EP0260105 | US4760025 | EP0305216 | JPS6474992 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | EP0331376 | WO8909259 | EP0407225 | WO9116422 | WO9205249 | WO9217517 | WO9219709 | WO9219708 | WO9318140 | WO9324618 | WO9401541 | WO9425578 | WO9425583 | WO9506720 | WO9510602 | WO9514783 | WO9522615 | WO9526397 | WO9530744 | WO9535381 | WO9600292 | WO9612012 | WO9613580 | WO9627002 | WO9629397 | WO9704079 | WO9707202 | US5648263 | US5679630 | US5691178 | WO9812307 | WO9815257 | US5776757 | WO0060063 | WO0060060 | WO0116285 | US6312936 | WO0216547 | WO0226024 | WO2005003274 | WO2005040372 | WO2005052161 | WO2005052146 | WO2006027086 | WO2006032327 | WO2006032397 | WO2006045275 | US7262042 | WO2008017570 | WO2008087497 | WO2008141880 | WO2009021867 | WO2009087524 | WO2009090576 | WO2009107091 | WO2009111258 | WO2009132870 | WO2009141173 | WO2009148983 | WO2010099997 | WO2010102861 | WO2010148624 | WO2010151906 | WO2011011799 | WO2011047987 | WO2012054820 | WO2012054058 | WO2012119859 | WO2013142495 | WO2013151970 | WO2014029479 | WO2015084813 | WO2016005338 | EP3162872 | WO2017079718 | WO2017079719 | WO2018085311 | WO2019008036 | WO2019007636 | WO2019075149 | WO2020058088 | WO2020EP61701 |