EP4176364 - BLOKCHAIN-BASED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PUBLISHING AN OPERATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAGANI, Alessio London W1W 8AP / GB | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/19] | Townsend, Martyn, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 21763359.3 | 23.08.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021EP73219 | Priority number, date | GB20200014825 | 21.09.2020 Original published format: GB 202014825 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022058124 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176364 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, H04L9/32, G06F21/12 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H04L9/3236 (EP,KR);
G06F21/57 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/10 (GB);
G06F21/12 (EP,KR,US);
G16Y30/10 (KR);
H04L9/50 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | BLOKKAIN-BASIERTES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERÖFFENTLICHUNG EINES BETRIEBSSYSTEMS | [2023/19] | English: | BLOKCHAIN-BASED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PUBLISHING AN OPERATING SYSTEM | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ FAISANT APPEL À UNE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS PERMETTANT DE PUBLIER UN SYSTÈME D'EXPLOITATION | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 02.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2017031676 (CECCHETTI ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,18,21-25,27-29 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0020] , [0023] - [0030] - [0039] , [0041] , [0044] - [0047] - [0057] * * figures 1, 5, 6, 7, 8 * [A] 9-17 [I] 3-7,20,26; | [A]EP3404891 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] - [0010] - [0041] , [0050] , [0160] - [0161] ** figures 8-1, 8-2, 10 *; | [XAI]US2020042305 (SU WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,27-29 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] , [0025] - [0028] * * figures 5, 6 * [A] 9-17 [I] 3,6-8,18-26 |