EP4116613 - FLOW PASSAGE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHMAE, Kiyotaka c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO., LTD., 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 02 /
KATANAYA, Masashi c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO., LTD., 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21763710.7 | 14.01.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021JP01034 | Priority number, date | JP20200036097 | 03.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020036097 | [2023/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021176854 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4116613 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16K27/00, F16L39/00, F16J15/06, F16J15/10 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
F16J15/061 (EP);
F16K27/00 (KR);
F16J15/106 (EP,US);
F16J15/06 (KR);
F16J15/062 (EP);
F16K27/003 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | F16K27/00, F16L39/00, F16J15/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSKANALEINHEIT | [2023/02] | English: | FLOW PASSAGE UNIT | [2023/02] | French: | UNITÉ DE PASSAGE D'ÉCOULEMENT | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2022 | Translation filed | 26.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2003086579 (CKD CORP) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [A] 2,3; | [XY]US2004089837 (BAUER BERTRAM [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0014]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]JP2005140230 (CKD CORP) [Y] 2,3* figures 16-17 *; | [XA]US2015068613 (TASKAR MARK [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 4B * [A] 2,3 | International search | [A]JPH08312900 (CKD CORP) [A] 1-3* 1,5 *; | [XY]JP2003086579 (CKD CORP) [X] 1 * 0042, 2 * [Y] 2-3; | [Y]JP2005140230 (CKD CORP) [Y] 2-3 * 0013, 14-17 * | by applicant | JP2019518175 |