EP4116694 - SAMPLE SUPPORT, IONIZATION METHOD, AND MASS SPECTROMETRY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTANI Masahiro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
OHMURA Takayuki c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
TASHIRO Akira c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21764656.1 | 15.01.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021JP01302 | Priority number, date | JP20200038909 | 06.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020038909 | [2023/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021176856 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4116694 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, H01J49/04, G01N27/62 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H01J49/0418 (EP);
H01J49/0409 (US);
H01J49/161 (US);
H01J49/164 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | PROBENTRÄGER, IONISIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND MASSENSPEKTROMETRIEVERFAHREN | [2023/02] | English: | SAMPLE SUPPORT, IONIZATION METHOD, AND MASS SPECTROMETRY METHOD | [2023/02] | French: | SUPPORT D'ÉCHANTILLON, PROCÉDÉ D'IONISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2022 | Translation filed | 04.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 19.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2004510996 (BIOTROVE, INC.) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2004354376 (BECTON DICKINSON CO) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2009504161 (BIOTROVE, INC.) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2014021048 (JEOL LTD) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2015116627 (UNIV ARIZONA STATE [US]) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP6093492B (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2019058857 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2019155967 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2019155836 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP])[A] 1-13; | [A]WO2020026629 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 | by applicant | JP6093492B |