EP4115515 - ELECTROSTATIC MOTOR HAVING UNIPOLAR DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wisconsin Alumni Research Foundation 614 Walnut Street Madison, WI 53726 / US | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILLEEN, Peter 3906 Mammoth Trail Madison, WI 53719 / US | 02 /
LUDOIS, Daniel, Colin 7672 Payvery Trail Middleton, WI 53562 / US | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21764854.2 | 16.02.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021US18251 | Priority number, date | US202016811288 | 06.03.2020 Original published format: US202016811288 | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021178131 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4115515 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02N1/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H02N1/004 (EP,US);
H02N1/002 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHER MOTOR MIT UNIPOLAREM ANTRIEB | [2023/02] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC MOTOR HAVING UNIPOLAR DRIVE | [2023/02] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTROSTATIQUE À ENTRAÎNEMENT UNIPOLAIRE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 26.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3629624 (STAUDTE JUERGEN H) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 3, line 59 - line 61 * * column 7, line 47 - line 55 * * column 7, line 70 - column 8, line 5 * * column 8, line 25 - line 29 * * column 8, line 35 - line 44 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 11 * * figures 1,9-11 *[A] 3,6-8,12-15 | International search | [Y]JP2009232667 (SAKAI TOSHIO) [Y] 15 * See paragraphs [0003]-[0004] and figures 8-10. *; | [Y]JP2013048557 (SHINSEI INDUSTRIES CO) [Y] 8-14 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0035] and figures 1-8. *; | [Y]US2016099663 (PETROWSKY MATTHEW AARON [US], et al) [Y] 7 * See paragraphs [0064], [0066] and figures 9E, 10A-10B. *; | [Y]US9960719 (GHULE ADITYA N [US], et al) [Y] 7-16; | [Y]US2018183302 (CHEN SHIBO [CN], et al) [Y] 16* See claim 5 and figure 4. * |