EP4115145 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DEPTH ESTIMATION BY LEARNING TRIANGULATION AND DENSIFICATION OF SPARSE POINTS FOR MULTI-VIEW STEREO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, FL 33322 / US | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINHA, Ayan Tuhinendu 301 King Street San Francisco, California 94158 / US | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21764896.3 | 05.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021US21239 | Priority number, date | US202062985773P | 05.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062985773 P | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021178919 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4115145 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01C11/06, H04N13/00, G06T7/593, H04N13/128 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04N13/128 (EP);
G06T7/596 (US);
G06T7/593 (EP);
G06T7/73 (US);
G06T9/002 (US);
H04N13/15 (US);
H04N13/161 (US);
H04N13/282 (US);
G06T2207/10012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10021 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | G01C11/06, H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR TIEFENSCHÄTZUNG DURCH LERNTRIANGULATION UND VERDICHTUNG VON SPÄRLICHEN PUNKTEN FÜR STEREO MIT MEHREREN ANSICHTEN | [2023/02] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DEPTH ESTIMATION BY LEARNING TRIANGULATION AND DENSIFICATION OF SPARSE POINTS FOR MULTI-VIEW STEREO | [2023/02] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ESTIMATION DE PROFONDEUR PAR APPRENTISSAGE DE TRIANGULATION ET DE DENSIFICATION DE POINTS ÉPARS POUR STÉRÉO MULTIVUE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015262412 (GRUBER LUKAS [AT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]US2015269723 (KARAM LINA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0070] *; | [A]US10304193 (WANG YUNZHI [US], et al) [A] 3,5,11,13 * column 2, line 1 - line 11 ** column 9, line 33 * | International search | [A]US2012163672 (MCKINNON DAVID [US]) [A] 1-16 * entire document (especially Abstract & [0038], [0108], [0200]). *; | [A]US2014049612 (ISHII YASUNORI [JP]) [A] 1-16 * entire document (especially Abstract & para [0015], [0018], [0036], [0037], [0054]). *; | [A]US2014192154 (JEONG SEUNG-SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document (especially Abstract & para [0009], [0045], [0052], [0084], [0110, [0144]). *; | [A]US2015237329 (VENKATARAMAN KARTIK [US], et al) [A] 1-16* entire document. *; | [A]US2015262412 (GRUBER LUKAS [AT], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document (especially para [00031], [0032], [0035], [0036], [0045]-[0047], [0051], [0098]). *; | [A]US2018176545 (AFLAKI BENI PAYMAN [FI]) [A] 1-16 * entire document (especially Abstract & para [0004], [0057], [0058], [0061]). *; | [A]US2019108683 (VALLI SEPPO T [FI], et al) [A] 1-16 * entire document (especially para [0007],- [0033], [0042], [0047], [0049], [0096], [0129], [0132]) * |