EP4114313 - PROSTHETIC CARDIAC VALVE DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shifamed Holdings, LLC 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARGENTO, Claudio 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
BACKUS, Andrew 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 03 /
YANG, Alice 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21765014.2 | 03.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021US20704 | Priority number, date | US202062984595P | 03.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062984595 P | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021178560 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114313 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
A61F2/2409 (EP,US);
A61F2/2436 (EP,US);
A61F2/2457 (EP);
A61F2/2466 (EP,US);
A61F2/2418 (EP);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | HERZKLAPPENPROTHESENVORRICHTUNGEN, -SYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/02] | English: | PROSTHETIC CARDIAC VALVE DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | [2023/02] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES POUR VALVULES CARDIAQUES PROTHÉTIQUES | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 05.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4725274 (LANE ERNEST [US], et al); | [A]US7534261 (FRIEDMAN ROBERT S [US]); | [YA]US2016199177 (SPENCE PAUL A [US], et al); | [A]US2017071732 (CONKLIN BRIAN S [US], et al); | [Y]US2018250127 (MAIMON DAVID [IL], et al) | International search | [A]US2014379074 (SPENCE PAUL A [US], et al); | [XYA]US2016199177 (SPENCE PAUL A [US], et al); | [A]US2016228247 (MAIMON DAVID [IL], et al); | [Y]US2017189177 (SCHWEICH JR CYRIL J [US], et al); | [Y]WO2019164516 (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]); | [YA]US2020060852 (ARGENTO CLAUDIO [US], et al) | by applicant | US2016199177 | US2018250127 | WO2019US57082 | WO2020US27744 | WO2020US58413 |