Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.07.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
05.05.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
05.05.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
17.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.12.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
09.12.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
14.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.09.2022 | Change - representative | |
30.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.03.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
10.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |