EP4115901 - LIVE-PATHOGEN-MIMETIC NANOPARTICLES BASED ON PATHOGEN CELL WALL SKELETON, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROGENEER INC. 1002, 12, Digital-ro 31-gil Guro-gu Seoul 08380 / KR | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Yong Taik 524-1301, 151, Naejeong-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13597 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sang Nam 3-605, 24, Hwasan-ro 203beon-gil, Jangan-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16417 / KR | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21765344.3 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021KR02508 | Priority number, date | KR20200025780 | 02.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200025780 | KR20210026013 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210026013 | [2023/02] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021177679 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4115901 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K9/19, A61K39/00, A61K9/51 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (US);
A61K2039/55511 (EP);
A61K2039/55555 (US);
A61K2039/55594 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | A61K39/39, A61K9/19, A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | LEBENDPATHOGENMIMETISCHE NANOPARTIKEL AUF BASIS EINES KRANKHEITSERREGERZELLWANDSKELETTS UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/02] | English: | LIVE-PATHOGEN-MIMETIC NANOPARTICLES BASED ON PATHOGEN CELL WALL SKELETON, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2023/02] | French: | NANOPARTICULES MIMÉTIQUES D'AGENT PATHOGÈNE VIVANT BASÉES SUR UN SQUELETTE DE PAROI CELLULAIRE D'AGENT PATHOGÈNE, ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2022 | Translation filed | 30.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3922266 (RESEARCH & BUSINESS FOUND SUNGKYUNKWAN UNIV [KR]) [E] 1-17* figure 8; example 2 *; | [X] - NAKAMURA TAKASHI ET AL, "Nanoparticulation of BCG-CWS for application to bladder cancer therapy", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20131231), vol. 176, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2013.12.027, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 44 - 53, XP028665634 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 45, column left, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * paragraph 2.2 * * paragraph 3.3;; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2013.12.027 | [A] - MASUDA HIDEYUKI ET AL, "Application of BCG-CWS as a Systemic Adjuvant by Using Nanoparticulation Technology", MOLECULAR PHARMACEUTICS, US, (20181203), vol. 15, no. 12, doi:10.1021/acs.molpharmaceut.8b00919, ISSN 1543-8384, pages 5762 - 5771, XP093131679 [A] 1-17 * page 5764, column lect, paragraph 6; figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.molpharmaceut.8b00919 | [A] - PAIK T H ET AL, "Mycobacterial cell-wall skeleton as a universal vaccine vehicle for antigen conjugation", VACCINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 28, no. 50, ISSN 0264-410X, (20101123), pages 7873 - 7880, (20101123), XP027553549 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph 2.3 * * page 7874, column left, paragraph 2 * | [A] - DOWLING DAVID J., "Recent Advances in the Discovery and Delivery of TLR7/8 Agonists as Vaccine Adjuvants", IMMUNOHORIZONS, (20180701), vol. 2, no. 6, doi:10.4049/immunohorizons.1700063, pages 185 - 197, XP055895475 [A] 1-17 * page 1898, column left, paragraph 2 * * page 2; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/immunohorizons.1700063 | [A] - BOB J. IGNACIO ET AL, "Toll-like Receptor Agonist Conjugation: A Chemical Perspective", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, US, (20180129), vol. 29, no. 3, doi:10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.7b00808, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 587 - 603, XP055598375 [A] 1-17 * page 595, column right, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.7b00808 | [T] - JIN SEUNG MO ET AL, "A nanoadjuvant that dynamically coordinates innate immune stimuli activation enhances cancer immunotherapy and reduces immune cell exhaustion", NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, London, vol. 18, no. 4, doi:10.1038/s41565-022-01296-w, ISSN 1748-3387, (20230112), pages 390 - 402, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/s41565-022-01296-w.pdf, XP093131527 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41565-022-01296-w | International search | [A]KR20180093813 (DANDI BIOSCIENCE INC [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; and claims 1-17. *; | [A]KR20190061741 (RESEARCH & BUSINESS FOUND SUNGKYUNKWAN UNIV [KR]) [A] 1-20* See abstract; and claims 1-9. *; | [A] - Nakamura Takashi; Fukiage Masafumi; Higuchi Megumi; Nakaya Akihiro; Yano Ikuya; Miyazaki Jun; Nishiyama Hiroyuki; Akaza Hideyuki; Ito Toshihiro; Hosokawa Hiroyuki; Nakayama Toshinori; Harashima Hideyoshi, "Nanoparticulation of BCG-CWS for application to bladder cancer therapy", Journal of Controlled Release, Elsevier, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20131231), vol. 176, doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2013.12.027, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 44 - 53, XP028665634 [A] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2013.12.027 | by applicant | WO2007024612 | WO2010014913 | WO2010054215 | US2010143301 | WO2010133885 | WO2011022508 | WO2011022509 | WO2011027022 | WO2011049677 | WO2011057148 | WO2012066335 | WO2012066336 | WO2012067268 | WO2012080730 | WO2012097177 | WO2012097173 | WO2012136834 | WO2012156498 | WO2013068438 | WO2013117615 | WO2013172479 | KR20140041134 | WO2014053516 | WO2014053595 | WO2014056593 | WO2014076221 | US8846697 | WO2014207082 | WO2015014815 | WO2015023598 | WO2016007765 | WO2016023511 | WO2016044182 | WO2016055553 | WO2016091698 | WO2016096778 | WO2016141092 | WO2016142250 | WO2016180691 | WO2016180743 | WO2017035230 | WO2017046112 | WO2017076346 | WO2017102652 | WO2017133683 | WO2017133686 | WO2017133684 | WO2017133687 | WO2017197624 | WO2017202704 | WO2017202703 | WO2017216054 | WO2017219931 | WO2018002319 | WO2018041763 | WO2018045144 | WO2018068593 | WO2018078149 | WO2018095426 | US2018215720 | WO2018196823 | CN108794486 | WO2018210298 | CN108948016 | WO2018233648 | WO2019036023 | WO2019035969 | WO2019035970 | WO2019035971 | WO2019035968 | WO2019040491 | KR20200025780 | KR20200097656 | KR20210026013 | WO2009US35563 | WO2015US28264 | WO2015US39776 | WO2016US20499 |