Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
19.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.05.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
05.05.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
17.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.12.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
09.12.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
14.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.09.2022 | Change - representative | |
30.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.08.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
10.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |