EP4097538 - COMFORT FIT SLIP-RESISTANT EYEWEAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Looloops, LLC 9286 E. Flathom Dr. Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOO, Kent, Chill 9286 E. Flathorn Dr. Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | 02 /
VELASQUEZ, Joseph Pepe, Elijio 464 S. Farmer Ave. 105 Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | 03 /
ALLEN, Daniel, W. 464 S. Farmer Ave. 105 Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | 04 /
BARRETT, Joseph, M. 464 S. Farmer Ave. 105 Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21765398.9 | 04.03.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021US20896 | Priority number, date | US202062985210P | 04.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062985210 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021178680 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4097538 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/00, G02C5/12, A61F9/02 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
G02C5/126 (EP,KR,US);
G02C2200/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | RUTSCHFESTES BRILLENSYSTEM MIT KOMFORTSITZ | [2022/49] | English: | COMFORT FIT SLIP-RESISTANT EYEWEAR SYSTEM | [2022/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LUNETTES ANTIDÉRAPANT À AJUSTEMENT CONFORTABLE | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 27.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4695140 (BONONI WALTER H [DE]) [Y] 7 * col. 3 l. 8 - 13;; figures 1,2 * [A] 3,8; | [XY]US4924245 (DIANITSCH FRANZ [AT]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * col. 4 l. 34 - col. 6 l. 30; column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 30; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9,10; | [Y]WO2007148352 (SAFILO SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 12* page 3, line 7 - line 24; figure 8 *; | [XY]EP2829904 (SDS INVESTCORP AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0023]; figures 15,22 * [Y] 9,10,13-15; | [XYI]IT201600100284 (GENERAL BUILDING SAS DI DE GIACOMI GIANCARLO) [X] 1-4,6-8,11,13 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * [Y] 7,9,10,12 [I] 13-15; | [XY]KR20180054115 (KIM EUN SOL [KR]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 7,9,10,13-15; | [Y]WO2019194469 (WORLD TREND CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 9,10 * figure 5 * | International search | [A]US2501259 (BRANDT EDWARD A) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [Y]US4142784 (BONONI WALTER H) [Y] 6 * , entire document *; | [A]US4802754 (NEEF HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [Y]US4904076 (KAPPLER MANFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 3,7-8 * , entire document *; | [XY]US4924245 (DIANITSCH FRANZ [AT]) [X] 1-2, 4-5, 9-10, 14, 17-19 * , entire document * [Y] 3, 6-8, 11, 13, 16; | [A]US5167036 (DAPRATO GARY A [CA]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US5583587 (HASEGAWA KEIZO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [X]DE10310912 (LUEBBE MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1, 12, 17, 20 * , entire document *; | [Y]US7314277 (LIN TITAN [TW]) [Y] 11,13,16 * , entire document *; | [X]US2016266402 (GOCHENOUR JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1, 15 * , entire document * |