EP4115513 - AUTO-TUNED SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFIER CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silanna Asia Pte Ltd 10 Collyer Quay 10-01 Ocean Financial Centre Singapore 049315 / SG | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADIC, Aleksandar 204 King St. East, Suite B103 Toronto, Ontario M5A 1J7 / CA | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21765404.5 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021IB51650 | Priority number, date | US202016811827 | 06.03.2020 Original published format: US202016811827 | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021176319 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4115513 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M1/00, H03K17/13, H03K17/284 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H02M3/33592 (EP,KR,US);
H02M1/0058 (EP);
H02M1/0083 (KR);
H02M1/083 (EP);
H02M3/158 (KR);
H02M3/1588 (EP,US);
H03K17/133 (EP);
H03K17/284 (EP);
H03K2017/307 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | H02M3/335, H02M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | SELBSTABSTIMMENDE SYNCHRONE GLEICHRICHTERSTEUERUNG | [2023/02] | English: | AUTO-TUNED SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFIER CONTROLLER | [2023/02] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR DE REDRESSEUR SYNCHRONE À RÉGLAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 10.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009097280 (WU HONGYANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2010124086 (CHEN WEI [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 5, 6b *; | [A]WO2015065592 (DIALOG SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US]) [A] 1-15* figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2016294298 (WONG PITLEONG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [A]CN107086793 (UNIV ZHEJIANG, et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2b-d, 3a *; | [A]US2018294734 (SONG HAIBIN [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 11 * | International search | [A]US7859868 (HUANG MING-HO [TW]) [A] 1-20 * Columns 2-5; and figures 2-4 *; | [A]US8416587 (CHEN WEI [US]) [A] 1-20 * Columns 8-14; and figures 5-9 *; | [A]US10063154 (PTACEK KAREL [CZ], et al) [A] 1-20* Columns 3-10; and figures 2-3b *; | [A]US2020036280 (YANG TA-YUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * Paragraphs [0034]-[0050]; and figures 2-5 *; | [A] - Alexander Connaughton, "Secondary Side Controlled Flyback Converter", DOCTORAL THESIS to achieve the university degree of Doktor der technischenWissenschaften, Graz University of Technology, AT, AT, (20180228), pages 1 - 136, DOCTORAL THESIS to achieve the university degree of Doktor der technischenWissenschaften, URL: https://diglib.tugraz.at/download.php?id=5b83d33db4fd4&location=browse, (20200825), XP055725002 [A] 1-20 * Pages 19-43, 69; and figures 4.2-5.7 * |