EP4168241 - METHOD OF FABRICATING A MAGNETIC DEFORMABLE MACHINE AND DEFORMABLE 3D MAGNETIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | 13.10.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstraße 8 80539 München / DE | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jiachen Toronto, Ontario M4C 5L8 / CA | 02 /
REN, Ziyu 70563 Vahingen / DE | 03 /
HU, Wenqi 71229 Leonberg / DE | 04 /
SITTI, Metin 70569 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21766392.1 | 04.08.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021EP71716 | Priority number, date | EP20200190336 | 10.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20190336 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022033933 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168241 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/48, H01L41/12, H01L41/47 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B22F10/10 (EP,US);
B22F10/80 (EP,US);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
F16B1/00 (US);
F16B11/006 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
C22C2202/02 (EP,US);
F16B2200/83 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/10, C22C2202/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MAGNETISCHEN VERFORMBAREN MASCHINE UND VERFORMBARE 3D-MAGNETMASCHINE | [2023/17] | English: | METHOD OF FABRICATING A MAGNETIC DEFORMABLE MACHINE AND DEFORMABLE 3D MAGNETIC MACHINE | [2023/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE MACHINE MAGNÉTIQUE DÉFORMABLE ET MACHINE MAGNÉTIQUE 3D DÉFORMABLE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 23.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015259099 (SEGAL EDO [US]) [A] 1-42* paragraphs [0001] - [0028] - [0 62] - [0067] *; | [X]US2018354120 (DILLER ERIC [CA], et al) [X] 1-42 * paragraphs [0082] - [0097] *; | [XI] - KIM YOONHO ET AL, "Printing ferromagnetic domains for untethered fast-transforming soft materials", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD, LONDON, vol. 558, no. 7709, doi:10.1038/S41586-018-0185-0, ISSN 0028-0836, (20180613), pages 274 - 279, (20180613), XP036524881 [X] 1-15,19-42 * page 274, line 278; figures 1-3 * [I] 16-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-018-0185-0 | [ ] - SHUAI WU ET AL, "Evolutionary Algorithm-Guided Voxel-Encoding Printing of Functional Hard-Magnetic Soft Active Materials", ADVANCED INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS, (20200526), vol. 2, no. 8, doi:10.1002/aisy.202000060, ISSN 2640-4567, page 2000060, XP055766056 [ ] * Sections 1, 2.1.;; figure 2c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aisy.202000060 | [XI] - MACRAE MONTGOMERY S ET AL, "Magneto-Mechanical Metamaterials with Widely Tunable Mechanical Properties and Acoustic Bandgaps", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20200623), URL: https://arxiv.org/abs/2006.12721v1, (20211101), XP081708284 [X] 1,25 * the whole document * [I] 2-24,26-42 |