EP4200464 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING ELECTROLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | 27.10.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLTZ, Oliver 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 02 /
SIEBEN, Rainer 47802 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
BULAN, Andreas 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
GROSSHOLZ, Michael 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21766621.3 | 24.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021EP73327 | Priority number, date | EP20200192385 | 24.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20192385 | [2023/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022043290 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200464 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25B9/05, C25B9/70, C25B15/08 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C25B1/04 (EP);
C25B15/029 (US);
C25B1/34 (EP);
C25B15/027 (US);
C25B15/085 (EP);
C25B15/087 (US);
C25B9/05 (EP);
C25B9/15 (US);
C25B9/70 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER ELEKTROLYSE | [2023/26] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING ELECTROLYSIS | [2023/26] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR EFFECTUER UNE ÉLECTROLYSE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 24.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2012090989 (HARYU EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 12,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 1-11 [I] 13; | [A]EP2495353 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]JP2016204743 (EXERGY POWER SYSTEMS CO LTD) [X] 12,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 7 [I] 1-6,8-11,13; | [XAI]EP3587622 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11 [I] 13-15; | [A]CN111074291 (XIAN TAIJIN INDUSTRIAL ELECTROCHEMICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | - SCHÖPF, A.SCHNEIDER, H., "Polypropylen für Rohrleitungssysteme", Kunststoffe, (19970000), vol. 87, no. 2, pages 198 - 201 | - MOUSSALEM, J.Appl.Electrochem., (20080000), vol. 38, no. 9, pages 1177 - 1194 |