EP4120720 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, INFORMATION INDICATION METHOD, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Kun No.168 Jinghai East Rd. Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Dajie No.168 Jinghai East Rd. Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21767157.7 | 03.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021CN78853 | Priority number, date | CN202010158878 | 09.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010158878 | [2023/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021179966 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120720 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W24/04, H04W72/04 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H04B7/15528 (EP);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04B7/04013 (EP);
H04W16/26 (EP);
H04W24/04 (CN);
H04W72/0446 (CN);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W88/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/03] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, INFORMATION INDICATION METHOD, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2023/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL, PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2022 | Translation filed | 05.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011117907 (HOOLI KARI JUHANJ [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,14,15 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0051] * [Y] 5-7,13; | [Y]CN103596251 (USTC UNIV SCIENCE TECH CN) [Y] 5-7,13* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * | International search | [X]CN103596251 (USTC UNIV SCIENCE TECH CN) [X] 1-62 * description, paragraphs [0017]-[0038] *; | [A]CN105246027 (YULONG COMP TELECOMM SCIENT) [A] 1-62 * entire document *; | [A]CN107360635 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-62 * entire document *; | [X]CN109547039 (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG) [X] 1-62 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0096] *; | [A]US2019341994 (MA YUNFEI [US], et al) [A] 1-62* entire document * |