EP4074017 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ROUTING INCOMING CALLS TO OPERATOR DEVICES BASED ON PERFORMANCE ANALYTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAASTLE, INC. 5 Penn Plaza, Floor 4 New York, NY 10001 / US | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILIP, Benny c/o Caastle, Inc., 5 Penn Plaza, Floor 4 New York, NY 10001 / US | 02 /
JAIN, Chirag c/o Caastle, Inc., 5 Penn Plaza, Floor 4 New York, NY 10001 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 21767846.5 | 05.03.2021 | [2022/42] | WO2021US21116 | Priority number, date | US202016818224 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: US202016818224 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021183385 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074017 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/523, H04M3/51 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H04M3/5233 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06393 (US);
H04M3/5175 (EP,US);
H04M3/5237 (US);
H04M2201/42 (EP,US);
H04M2203/401 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR LEITWEGLENKUNG VON ANKOMMENDEN ANRUFEN AN BEDIENGERÄTE BASIEREND AUF LEISTUNGSANALYSE | [2022/42] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ROUTING INCOMING CALLS TO OPERATOR DEVICES BASED ON PERFORMANCE ANALYTICS | [2022/42] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ORIENTER DES APPELS ENTRANTS VERS DES DISPOSITIFS D'OPÉRATEURS SUR LA BASE D'UNE ANALYSE DE PERFORMANCES | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005043986 (MCCONNELL MATTHEW G A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] ** paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] *; | [I]US2017111509 (MCGANN CONOR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0144] * | International search | [Y]US2005043986 (MCCONNELL MATTHEW G A [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2005071223 (JAIN VIVEK [IN], et al) [A] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2012158465 (GOLEMBIEWSKI KEITH E [US]) [A] 1-20* , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2013060587 (BAYRAK HALIL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2013236002 (JENNINGS TERRY DON [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [Y]US2015213506 (PARIKH NIRMAL [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2015381807 (KONIG YOCHAI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2016189164 (TOLKSDORF JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2016295019 (O'CONNOR NEIL [IE], et al) [A] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [Y]US2017111509 (MCGANN CONOR [US], et al) [Y] 4, and 7-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2018034965 (TE BOOIJ MERIJN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2019268475 (MORAN THOMAS [IE]) [A] 1-20 * , See entire documents. * |